Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Nguyên Chi Linh

Archbishop of Huế


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1949 BornBa Lang, Tinh Gia
20 Dec 199243.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
21 May 200454.4AppointedBishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam
4 Aug 200454.7Ordained BishopBishop of Thanh Hoá, Viet Nam
29 Oct 201666.9AppointedArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyên Chi Linh (VIAF: 283650508)
Archbishop Joseph Nguyên Chi Linh (born ) Archbishop of Huế

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Huế.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,668
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Oct 2016