Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim-Pierre Buléon, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Titular Bishop of Chariopolis

Prefect of Sénégal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1862Born
9 Nov 188422.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 1885¹23.4ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Jun 189937.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal
6 Jun 189937.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
6 Jun 189937.2AppointedPrefect of Sénégal
28 Oct 189937.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chariopolis
13 Jun 190038.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Senegambia, Senegal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joachim-Pierre Buléon (VIAF: 79136754)
Bishop Joachim-Pierre Buléon C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Senegambia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlumergat, France
Ordained PriestChevilly
Ordained BishopSainte-Anne d'Auray, Basilica
Death PlaceDakar

  • a priest for 15.5 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017