Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Émile Rouard

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1839Born
20 May 186424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dijon, France
30 May 189656.5SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
25 Jun 189656.5ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
20 Aug 189656.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
19 Feb 191474.2DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Émile Rouard (VIAF: 160069699)
Bishop Pierre-Émile Rouard (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontigny-sur-Aube
Ordained BishopCathedral, Dijon, Diocese of Dijon
Death PlaceCannes

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017