Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal

Dioecesis Sancti Ludovici Senegalensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ernest Sambou, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 February 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Dakar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Senegal
  • Square Kilometers: 73,315 (28,317 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 260, Saint-Louis, Senegal
  • Telephone: 33.961.11.28
  • Fax: 33.961.26.57

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sénégal
1763ErectedDiocese of Funchal Prefecture Apostolic of Sénégal (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
27 January 1936Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Sénégal Prefecture Apostolic of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
18 December 1965Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Saint-Louis du Sénégal Diocese of Nouakchott (erected)
Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
15 February 1966ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Saint-Louis du Sénégal Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
13 August 1970Territory LostDiocese of Kaolack
Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
Prefecture Apostolic of Tambacounda (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint-Louis du Sénégal
19691,523585,000.3%151510123196ap1971
19802,319976,000.2%101023116203ap1981
19903,6011,140,735.3%3151820024257ap1991
19994,0391,404,664.3%6142020121226ap2000
20003,7991,545,238.2%6142018923216ap2001
20014,0121,545,238.3%6101625017186ap2002
20024,0201,545,238.3%7101723616186ap2003
20034,1421,545,238.3%771429512146ap2004
20044,8501,578,853.3%881630310197ap2005
20106,5001,789,341.4%1071738211247ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 23 Jun 2013