Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Choma

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Patara

Titular See: (Rector Emeritus, Ukrainian Catholic University)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1923BornChyriv
29 Jun 194925.6Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
2 Apr 197753.3Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
16 Jun 199167.6ResignedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ruthenian), Poland
22 Feb 199672.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Patara
3 Feb 200682.2DiedTitular Bishop of Patara

MicroData Summary for Ivan Choma:
Bishop Ivan Choma (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Patara

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,664
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,729
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013