Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Atanasij Hryhor Velykyj (Welykyj), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1918Born
27 Apr 194122.4Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 Dec 194628.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 Dec 194628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
12 Feb 196344.2AppointedSuperior General of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
7 Jul 197657.6CeasedSuperior General of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
24 Dec 198264.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)

MicroData Summary for Atanasij Hryhor Velykyj (Welykyj) (VIAF: 40659344)
Father Atanasij Hryhor Velykyj (Welykyj) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTurynka, Ukraine

  • a priest for 36.0 years

Source(s):
  • b/c1: CB, 4 Jun 2015
  • b: CB, 10 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast