Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lazzaro Mladenoff, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)

Titular Bishop of Satala in Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1854Born
30 Sep 187420.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
12 Jun 188328.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)
12 Jun 188328.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
5 Aug 188329.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satala in Armenia
8 Apr 189540.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)
4 Mar 191863.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Macedonia (Thessalonika) (Bulgarian)

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Mladenoff (VIAF: 23155184)
Bishop Lazzaro Mladenoff C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Macedonia (Thessalonika)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBansko
Ordained BishopS. Benoit, Constantinople

  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast