Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Patrick Rohlman

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

Titular Archbishop of Cotrada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1876Born
21 Dec 190125.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 192751.1AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
25 Jul 192751.3Ordained BishopBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
15 Jun 194468.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
15 Jun 194468.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Macra
11 Nov 194670.6SucceededArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
2 Dec 195478.7RetiredArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
2 Dec 195478.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotrada
13 Sep 195781.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Patrick Rohlman
Archbishop Henry Patrick Rohlman (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAppelhausen, Germany

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,927, Number 43
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 377, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast