Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Olivier Elzéar Mathieu

Deceased

Archbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1853Born
2 Jun 187824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
21 Jul 191157.5AppointedBishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
5 Nov 191157.8Ordained BishopBishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
9 Dec 191561.9AppointedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
26 Oct 192975.8DiedArchbishop of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Olivier Elzéar Mathieu
Archbishop Olivier Elzéar Mathieu (born , died ) Archbishop of Regina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Roch

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast