Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexis-Xyste Bernard

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1847Born
1 Oct 187123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
16 Dec 190557.9AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
15 Feb 190658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
17 Jun 192375.4DiedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alexis-Xyste Bernard (VIAF: 317273647)
Bishop Alexis-Xyste Bernard (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeloeil
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Death PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 6
  • c1: CB, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017