Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves-Marie-Henri Bescond

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

Titular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1924Born
29 Jun 194925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
26 Jan 197146.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Corbeil, France
26 Jan 197146.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
28 Mar 197146.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Thibilitanae
12 Jul 197955.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Meaux, France
20 Oct 198662.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Meaux, France
23 Aug 201894.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Yves-Marie-Henri Bescond
Bishop Yves-Marie-Henri Bescond (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClamart
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Death PlaceMaison Marie-Thérèse, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Ivry-sur-Seine, Diocese of Créteil

  • a priest for 69.1 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • opd/c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • d/loc: AJ, 24 Aug 2018
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1971, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast