Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Stanislaw Szwagrzyk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

Titular Bishop of Ita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1923Born
5 Jun 194925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
3 Nov 196440.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
3 Nov 196440.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Ita
7 Feb 196541.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ita
7 Dec 199269.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Stanislaw Szwagrzyk
Bishop Tadeusz Stanislaw Szwagrzyk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLgota Wielka, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained PriestHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Ordained BishopHoly Family, Cathedral Basilica, Częstochowa, Diocese of Częstochowa
Death PlaceKraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}
Buried Place (Original)Bishop's Crypt, Mystery of the Resurrection in Emmaus, Church, Częstochowa, Archdiocese of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast