Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Musiel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Częstochowa

Titular Bishop of Tamata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1915BornJaniki
22 May 194126.4Ordained PriestPriest
12 Nov 196550.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
12 Nov 196550.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamata
30 Jan 196651.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamata
1 Feb 199277.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
2 Dec 199277.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Częstochowa, Poland

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Musiel:
Bishop Franciszek Musiel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Częstochowa

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013