Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Franciszek Wątroba

Bishop of Rzeszów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1953 BornWieluń
27 May 197925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Częstochowa, Poland
20 Apr 200046.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa, Poland
20 Apr 200046.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
20 May 200046.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
14 Jun 201359.5AppointedBishop of Rzeszów, Poland
20 Jul 201359.6InstalledBishop of Rzeszów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Franciszek Wątroba:
Bishop Jan Franciszek Wątroba (born ) Bishop of Rzeszów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rzeszów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,771
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015