Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabio Maria Cardinal Asquini

Deceased

Secretary of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1802Born
26 Feb 182522.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 183735.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
8 Oct 183735.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
22 Dec 183735.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sicily, Italy
9 Apr 183936.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
22 Jan 184441.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
22 Jan 184441.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Apr 184542.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 184542.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
2 May 184744.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
8 May 186360.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
12 Jul 187269.9AppointedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other
21 Sep 187775.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
23 Dec 187876.3DiedSecretary of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Fabio Maria Asquini (VIAF: 89734368)
Fabio Maria Cardinal Asquini (born , died ) Secretary of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFagagna, Archdiocese of Udine, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
  • a cardinal for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jan 1844
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 49
  • ob/c2: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 161, and Page 360
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 31
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast