Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Peda, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1767Born
27 Nov 178720.2ProfessedMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
24 Mar 179224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
12 Jul 184173.9AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
18 Jul 184173.9Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
21 Jul 184375.9DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Giuseppe Peda
Bishop Carlo Giuseppe Peda B. (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1841, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast