Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Colli

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1805Born
19 Sep 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Adria, Italy
27 Mar 186761.6AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
2 Jul 186761.9Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
30 Oct 186863.2DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Colli
Bishop Pietro Colli (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdria, Diocese of Adria
Ordained BishopVallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast