Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Napolitano

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1801BornBrusciano
18 Sep 182423.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Nov 184443.1SelectedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
20 Jan 184543.3ConfirmedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
9 Mar 184543.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
26 Nov 185756.2DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Napolitano:
Bishop Luigi Napolitano (born , died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013