Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria d’Alessandro

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1799Born
29 Mar 182324.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 184344.0SelectedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
19 Jun 184344.2ConfirmedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
24 Jun 184344.2Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
6 Sep 184546.5SelectedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
24 Nov 184546.7ConfirmedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
15 Mar 184849.0DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria d’Alessandro
Bishop Giuseppe Maria d’Alessandro (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsculan. Apuliae
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 132, and Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast