Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Angelo de Martis, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1817Born
1 May 183618.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
30 Aug 184022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
22 Feb 186749.4AppointedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
19 Mar 186749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
24 Jun 190284.7DiedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Angelo de Martis
Bishop Salvatore Angelo de Martis O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari, Archdiocese of Sassari
Ordained BishopSte Marie in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017