Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Atanasio, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1807BornLucera
28 May 183123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 May 184436.6SelectedBishop of Lipari, Italy
22 Jul 184436.8ConfirmedBishop of Lipari, Italy
28 Jul 184436.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
Oct 1857³50.0ResignedBishop of Lipari, Italy
1877¹69.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Atanasio:
Bishop Bonaventura Atanasio C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lipari

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013