Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Marie Vibert

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1800BornYenne
18 Sep 182424.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 184040.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
1 Mar 184140.5ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
25 Mar 184140.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
31 Oct 187676.2DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie Vibert:
Bishop François-Marie Vibert (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013