Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Antonio Garibaldi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to France

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1797Born
18 Sep 181922.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Oct 183134.6AppointedOfficial to France
Jul 1836³39.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to France
1842²44.8ResignedApostolic Internuncio to France
22 Jan 184446.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
4 Feb 184446.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
7 Feb 184446.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sicily, Italy
30 Sep 185053.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
16 Jun 185356.3DiedApostolic Nuncio to France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Garibaldi (VIAF: 55009096)
Archbishop Pietro Antonio Garibaldi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 7
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 126, and Page 127, and Page 176
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast