Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvator-Alexandre-Félix-Carmel Brincat

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Alger, Algeria

Titular Bishop of Hadrumetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1857Born
27 May 188022.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 188931.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alger, Algeria
28 Jun 188931.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
7 Jul 188931.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
1903²45.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Alger, Algeria
2 Apr 191961.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Alger, Algeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvator-Alexandre-Félix-Carmel Brincat
Bishop Salvator-Alexandre-Félix-Carmel Brincat (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Alger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlger, Archdiocese of Alger
Ordained BishopN.D. d'Afrique, Alger, Archdiocese of Alger

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017