Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Roelens, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Girba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1858Born
8 Sep 188426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
30 Mar 189536.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Upper Congo {Congo Superiore}, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
30 Mar 189536.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
10 May 189637.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba
22 Sep 194183.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
25 Aug 194789.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Victor Roelens (VIAF: 7071095)
Bishop Victor Roelens M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Baudouinville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArdoye, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
Ordained BishopWhite Fathers, Church, Malines, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium
Death PlaceBaudouinville, Vicariate Apostolic of Baudouinville

  • a priest for 62.9 years
  • a bishop for 51.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 286
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017