Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NoŽl-Mathieu-Victor-Marie Gaussail

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1825BornBeaupuy
19 Mar 185226.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 188458.2SelectedBishop of Oran, Algeria
27 Mar 188458.3ConfirmedBishop of Oran, Algeria
1 May 188458.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oran, Algeria
2 Mar 188660.2SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
10 Jun 188660.5ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
21 Jul 188660.6InstalledBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
16 Feb 189973.1DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for NoŽl-Mathieu-Victor-Marie Gaussail:
Bishop NoŽl-Mathieu-Victor-Marie Gaussail (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 258, and Page 427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013