Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Joseph-Marie-Victoire de Cosnac

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1764Born
7 Apr 178723.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 181955.4SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
27 Sep 181955.5ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
7 Nov 181955.6Ordained BishopBishop of Meaux, France
28 Apr 183066.1SelectedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
5 Jul 183066.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
24 Oct 184379.5DiedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph-Marie-Victoire de Cosnac (VIAF: 317030537)
Archbishop Jean-Joseph-Marie-Victoire de Cosnac (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteaux de Cosnac

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 260, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast