Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gustav Adolf Cardinal von Hohenlohe-Schillingsfürst

Deceased

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1823Born
Jan 1849³25.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 185734.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
22 Nov 185734.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Edessa in Osrhoëne
22 Jun 186643.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 186643.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
15 Jul 187855.3AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
12 May 187956.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
Dec 1883³60.7ResignedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
10 Nov 188461.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
2 Dec 189572.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
30 Oct 189673.6DiedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gustav Adolf von Hohenlohe-Schillingsfürst (VIAF: 52454872)
Gustav Adolf Cardinal von Hohenlohe-Schillingsfürst (born , died ) Archpriest of Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRotenburg, Diocese of Rottenburg, Germany, Germany
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Sanctæ Marthæ, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
  • a cardinal for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 256, and Page 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 47, and Page 49
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 50
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017