Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Joseph Hirth, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kivu

Titular Bishop of Theveste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1854BornSpechbach-le-Bas, France
15 Sep 187824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
4 Dec 188935.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza, Uganda
4 Dec 188935.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Theveste
25 May 189036.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Theveste
13 Jul 189440.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Victoria Nyanza {Victoria-Nyanza Meridionale}, Tanzania
12 Dec 191258.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kivu, Burundi
25 Oct 192066.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kivu, Burundi
6 Jan 193176.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kivu, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Jean-Joseph Hirth:
Bishop Jean-Joseph Hirth M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kivu

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 538

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013