Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léonce Bridoux, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tanganika

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1852BornHenin-Liétard, France
24 Oct 187422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
15 Jun 188836.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania
15 Jun 188836.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
8 Jul 188836.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
20 Oct 189038.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Léonce Bridoux:
Bishop Léonce Bridoux M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tanganika

  • a priest for 16.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 577

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013