Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joachim N’Dayen

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1934 BornLoko
22 Jul 196126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bangui, Central African Republic
5 Sep 196833.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
5 Sep 196833.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Culusi
5 Jan 196934.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Culusi
16 Sep 197035.7SucceededArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
26 Jul 200368.5ResignedArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Joachim N’Dayen
Archbishop Joachim N’Dayen (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangui

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bangui.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Jul 2016