Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla

Archidioecesis Tlalnepantlanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Carlos Aguiar Retes, Archbishop
  • Efraín Mendoza Cruz, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Francisco Ramírez Navarro, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Ricardo Guízar Díaz, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 17 June 1989
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: México
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 682 (263 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Metro-Circundante
  • Web Site: http://www.arqtlalnepantla.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 268, Av. Juárez 42, 54000 Tlalnepantla, Méx., México
  • Telephone: (55)5565.39.44
  • Fax: 5565.35.26

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tlalnepantla
13 January 1964ErectedArchdiocese of México
Diocese of Texcoco
Diocese of Tlalnepantla (erected)
5 February 1979Territory LostDiocese of Tlalnepantla
Diocese of Texcoco
Diocese of Cuautitlán (erected)
Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla
17 June 1989ElevatedDiocese of Tlalnepantla Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla
28 June 1995Territory LostDiocese of Texcoco
Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla
Diocese of Ecatepec (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tlalnepantla
1966670,520681,40098.4%84641484,53015422938ap1967
19701,080,0001,100,00098.2%172542264,778159355128ap1971
19762,685,0002,750,00097.6%280943747,1797186480208ap1977
19803,140,0003,250,00096.6%19210129310,71612227550220ap1981
Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla
19903,433,0003,769,00091.1%1985925713,3574123227153ap1991
19993,082,0033,312,16393.1%2156828310,8907134267124ap2000
20003,119,0793,341,26593.4%2207329310,6458139291134ap2001
20013,119,2044,753,80765.6%2307330310,2948141314140ap2002
20023,207,0223,480,00092.2%255783339,6308138355193ap2003
20033,494,0773,982,00087.7%258953539,8989172372192ap2004
20042,864,6993,264,73487.7%2631103737,68011162420192ap2005
20103,184,0003,980,00080.0%266763429,30911136296200ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011