Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco González Ramos

Bishop of Izcalli, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1958 BornPueblo Nuevo
2 May 198223.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of León, Guanajuato, México
18 Jul 198223.9Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
3 Jan 200445.4IncardinatedPriest of Irapuato, Guanajuato, México
9 Jun 201455.8AppointedBishop of Izcalli, México, México
22 Aug 201456.0Ordained BishopBishop of Izcalli, México, México

MicroData Summary for Francisco González Ramos:
Bishop Francisco González Ramos (born ) Bishop of Izcalli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Izcalli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2014
  • od: CB, 9 Jun 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 Jun 2014
  • c2+: CB, 22 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 24 Aug 2014