Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel Mancilla Sánchez

Bishop of Texcoco, México, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1950 Born
1 Jul 197424.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Luis Potosí, México
23 May 200151.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Texcoco, México, México
23 May 200151.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Reperi
24 Jun 200151.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Reperi
8 Nov 200555.7AppointedBishop of Ciudad Obregón, Sonora, México
18 Jun 200959.3AppointedBishop of Texcoco, México, México
12 Aug 200959.5InstalledBishop of Texcoco, México, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel Mancilla Sánchez
Bishop Juan Manuel Mancilla Sánchez (born ) Bishop of Texcoco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Texcoco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,996
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018