Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala

Archidioecesis Sancti Jacobi in Guatemala



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 25 April 2013
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Guatemala
  • Square Kilometers: 2,591 (1,000 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: https://www.arzobispadodeguatemala.com
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, 7a Avenida 6-21, Zona 1, 01001 Ciudad de Guatemala, Guatemala
  • Telephone: 2506-3560
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santiago de Guatemala
6 September 1531Territory LostDiocese of Santiago de Guatemala Diocese of Comayagua (erected)
18 December 1534ErectedDiocese of Santo Domingo Diocese of Santiago de Guatemala (erected)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Santiago de Guatemala (From Seville (Spain) to Mexico (Mexico))
23 June 1603Territory AddedDiocese of Verapaz (suppressed) Diocese of Santiago de Guatemala
Archdiocese of Guatemala
16 December 1743ElevatedDiocese of Santiago de Guatemala Archdiocese of Guatemala
28 September 1842Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala Diocese of San Salvador (erected) (El Salvador)
27 July 1921Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Quezaltenango, San Marcos, Huehuetenango, Totonicapán, Quiché, and Solóla) Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos (erected)
27 July 1921Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Alta Verapaz, Baja Verapaz, and Petén) Vicariate Apostolic of Verapaz and Petén (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Jalapa, Jutiapa, and El Progreso) Diocese of Jalapa (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Parts of Mazatenango or Suchitepéquez)
Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos (Solóla, El Quiche, and the rest of Mazatenango or Suchitepéquez)
Diocese of Sololá (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Zacapa, Chiquimula, and Izabal) Diocese of Zacapa (erected)
10 March 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Retalhuleu) Diocese of Quetzaltenango, Los Altos
27 April 1967Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Chimaltenango) Diocese of Sololá
9 May 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Escuintla) Territorial Prelature of Escuintla (erected)
27 April 1996Territory LostArchdiocese of Guatemala (Departamento Santa Rosa) Diocese of Santa Rosa de Lima (erected)
Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala
25 April 2013Name ChangedArchdiocese of Guatemala Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Guatemala
19481,922,0001,980,00097.1%47408722,091397365ap1951
19661,239,3001,483,22983.6%761302066,01620039064ap1967
19701,326,8921,429,76192.8%102102206,03123540698ap1971
19761,395,3301,403,75399.4%872643513,975494548100ap1977
19801,516,0001,525,00099.4%882723604,211505548103ap1981
19901,837,0002,500,00073.5%772843615,0882586622115ap1991
19993,000,0003,500,00085.7%1184105285,681610720150ap2000
20003,000,0003,600,00083.3%1044425465,4941658860160ap2001
20012,045,4562,922,08070.0%963254214,85835791,128125ap2002
20022,045,4562,922,08070.0%1023744764,29727661,700134ap2003
20032,249,0563,214,28070.0%1163995154,36737291,687135ap2004
20042,772,3173,696,42275.0%1474956424,31838151,687136ap2005
20063,486,0004,357,00080.0%1862834697,4323510719138ap2007
20103,846,0004,807,00080.0%2113205317,2423646869142ap2011
20124,039,0005,048,00080.0%2343045387,5073631886146ap2013
Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala
20144,237,0005,296,00080.0%1953665617,5523685917151ap2015
20174,537,0005,669,00080.0%2053645697,9733678882153ap2018
20204,814,7756,018,20080.0%19823643411,0933511817160ap2021
20224,991,0006,245,00079.9%3582255838,560417851161ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Santiago de Guatemala
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 151
  • Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 105, Page 643, and Page 644
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 27 Mar 2024