Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tulio Omar Pérez Rivera

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

Titular Bishop of Filaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1977 Born
31 Jul 200426.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
19 Mar 200527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
4 Sep 202042.9AppointedAdministrator of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
21 Sep 202144.0CeasedAdministrator of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
27 Jun 202244.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala
27 Jun 202244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Filaca
21 Sep 202245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Filaca

MicroData Summary for Tulio Omar Pérez Rivera
(WikiData: Q112750595)
Bishop Tulio Omar Pérez Rivera (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Antigua, Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Sololá, Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango
Ordained PriestCo-Cathedral, Chimaltenango, Diocese of Sololá-Chimaltenango
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ciudad de Guatemala, Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2022
  • od/loc: CB, 27 Jun 2022
  • ob: CB, 1 Jul 2022
  • c1+: CB, 21 Sep 2022
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 253, Number 20,999

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 21 Nov 2022