Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo de Villa y Vásquez, S.J.

Archbishop of Santiago de Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1954 Born
13 Aug 198329.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 199338.7Perpetual VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Jul 200450.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guatemala
9 Jul 200450.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
25 Sep 200450.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotaria
28 Jul 200753.2AppointedBishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
22 Sep 200753.4InstalledBishop of Sololá-Chimaltenango, Guatemala
2 Oct 201056.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
15 Oct 201056.4InstalledApostolic Administrator of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
17 Sep 201157.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Los Altos, Quetzaltenango-Totonicapán, Guatemala
9 Jul 202066.1AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Guatemala
3 Sep 202066.3InstalledArchbishop of Santiago de Guatemala

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo de Villa y Vásquez
Archbishop Gonzalo de Villa y Vásquez S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Santiago de Guatemala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Madrid, Spain
Ordained PriestPanamá, Archdiocese of Panamá
Ordained BishopAuditorio "Juan Pablo II", Guatemala, Archdiocese of Guatemala

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santiago de Guatemala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,693
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2020
  • i: CB, 13 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Sep 2020

Quantcast