Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal Silvestrini

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Priest of San Benedetto fuori Porta San Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1923Born
13 Jul 194622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Faenza, Italy
4 May 197955.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novaliciana
4 May 197955.5AppointedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State
27 May 197955.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Novaliciana
28 Jun 198864.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Benedetto fuori Porta San Paolo
28 Jun 198864.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jul 198864.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
24 May 199167.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
9 Jan 199975.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Benedetto fuori Porta San Paolo
7 Sep 200076.8RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
29 Aug 201995.8DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary for Achille Silvestrini
Achille Cardinal Silvestrini (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrisighella, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Faenza, Diocese of Faenza, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Family Chapel, Cemetery, Brisighella

  • a priest for 73.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d/loc/c1: CB, 29 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,909

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast