Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bolesław Twardowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1864Born
25 Jul 188622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
14 Sep 191854.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
14 Sep 191854.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Telmissus
12 Jan 191954.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Telmissus
3 Aug 192359.4AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
22 Nov 194480.7DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Bolesław Twardowski
Archbishop Bolesław Twardowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLwów, Archdiocese of Lviv
Ordained BishopLwów, Archdiocese of Lviv

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 1
  • c1: CB, 17 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 50
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 278, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 560, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast