Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael John Sheridan

Bishop Emeritus of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1945 Born
29 May 197126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Jul 199752.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Jul 199752.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
3 Sep 199752.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibiuca
4 Dec 200156.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA
30 Jan 200357.9SucceededBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA
17 Jun 201368.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
27 Feb 201468.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Pueblo, Colorado, USA
30 Apr 202176.1RetiredBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael John Sheridan (VIAF: 3797271)
Bishop Michael John Sheridan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Colorado Springs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colorado Springs.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 1997
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,042
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: CB, 23 Jun 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Apr 2021

Quantcast