Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alojz Uran

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1945Born
29 Jun 197025.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ljubljana, Slovenia
16 Dec 199247.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
16 Dec 199247.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Abula
6 Jan 199347.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abula
25 Oct 200459.7AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
5 Dec 200459.8InstalledArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
28 Nov 200964.8ResignedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
11 Apr 202075.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana, Slovenia

MicroData Summary for Alojz Uran
Archbishop Alojz Uran (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ljubljana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpodnje Gameljne, Diocese of Ljubljana
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceLjubljana, Archdiocese of Ljubljana

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,943
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 11 Apr 2020
  • i: CB, 17 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast