Catholic-Hierarchy DC

James Francis Aloysius Cardinal McIntyre

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1886Born
21 May 192134.9Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
16 Nov 194054.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
16 Nov 194054.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
8 Jan 194154.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
20 Jul 194660.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of New York, New York, USA
20 Jul 194660.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Paltus
7 Feb 194861.6AppointedArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
19 Mar 194861.7InstalledArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
12 Jan 195366.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195366.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
21 Jan 197083.5RetiredArchbishop of Los Angeles, California, USA
16 Jul 197993.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, California, USA

MicroData Summary for James Francis Aloysius McIntyre (VIAF: 62360239)
James Francis Aloysius Cardinal McIntyre (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
  • a cardinal for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1941, Number 1
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 669, Ascendance
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast