Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paluzzo Cardinal Paluzzi Altieri Degli Albertoni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1623Born
14 Jan 166440.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Feb 166642.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 166642.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
29 Mar 166642.8AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
2 May 166642.9Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
19 May 167046.9AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
2 Aug 167148.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
4 Aug 167148.1AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
19 Feb 167450.6ResignedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
1 Dec 168158.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
13 Nov 168461.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
28 Feb 168965.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Aug 169168.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1693²69.5AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
27 Jan 169874.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 Jun 169875.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ravenna, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Paluzzo Paluzzi Altieri Degli Albertoni (VIAF: 10091820)
Paluzzo Cardinal Paluzzi Altieri Degli Albertoni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ravenna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSaint Sylvestre in Capite, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Giovanni Battista Chapel, S. Maria in Campitelli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 32.1 years
  • a cardinal for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 144
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jul 2020

Quantcast