Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugeniusz Baziak

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

Apostolic Administrator of Kraków {Cracow}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1890Born
14 Jul 191222.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Sep 193343.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
15 Sep 193343.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Phocaea
5 Nov 193343.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phocaea
1 Mar 194453.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
1 Mar 194453.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Parium
22 Nov 194454.7SucceededArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
20 Apr 195161.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
23 Jul 195161.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
15 Jun 196272.2DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Eugeniusz Baziak (VIAF: 52857431)
Archbishop Eugeniusz Baziak (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTernopil
Ordained BishopLviv, Archdiocese of Lviv
Death PlaceWarszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}, Poland
Buried Place (Original)Kraków, Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 81
  • bp/opd/c1: CB, 31 Aug 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 39
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 245, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 278, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 560, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,280

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast