Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Gemma, F.D.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Isernia-Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1931Born
11 Oct 194716.3First VowsMember of Sons of Divine Providence
29 Sep 195322.3Perpetual VowsMember of Sons of Divine Providence
22 Dec 195625.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sons of Divine Providence
28 Apr 195725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of Divine Providence
7 Dec 199059.5AppointedBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
6 Jan 199159.5Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
2 Feb 199159.6InstalledBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
5 Aug 200675.1RetiredBishop of Isernia-Venafro, Italy
2 Sep 201988.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Isernia-Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Gemma
Bishop Andrea Gemma F.D.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Isernia-Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained DeaconSanti XII Apostoli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained PriestSant’Agnese, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePoliclinico Agostino Gemelli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santuario della Madonna della Guardia, Crypt, Tortona, Diocese of Tortona

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,302
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2019
  • loc/firs/perp: AM, 24 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast