Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Gioia, O.F.M. Cap.

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1938 Born
29 Jun 196526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Feb 199051.5AppointedArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
5 Apr 199051.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
9 Jan 199354.4ResignedArchbishop of Camerino-San Severino Marche, Italy
8 Jul 199657.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
25 Jul 200163.0ResignedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gioia (VIAF: 97847971)
Archbishop Francesco Gioia O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Vito dei Normanni
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Council for the Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,782
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast