Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel Charles Palmer-Buckle

Archbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1950 Born
12 Dec 197626.4Ordained PriestPriest of Accra, Ghana
6 Jul 199242.0AppointedBishop of Koforidua, Ghana
6 Jan 199342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Koforidua, Ghana
30 Mar 200554.7AppointedArchbishop of Accra, Ghana
11 May 201867.9AppointedArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
11 May 201867.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Accra, Ghana
5 Jul 201868.0InstalledArchbishop of Cape Coast, Ghana
1 Mar 201968.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Accra, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Charles Palmer-Buckle
Archbishop Gabriel Charles Palmer-Buckle (born ) Archbishop of Cape Coast

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAxim
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cape Coast.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,938
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 May 2018
  • i: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast