Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Elio Cardinal Sgreccia

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Academy for Life

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1928Born
29 Jun 195224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Fano, Italy
5 Nov 199264.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
5 Nov 199264.4AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
6 Jan 199364.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Minor
1 Jun 199465.9AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Academy for Life
3 Apr 199667.8ResignedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for the Family
3 Jan 200576.5AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life
17 Jun 200880.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Academy for Life
20 Nov 201082.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
20 Nov 201082.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 201182.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
5 Jun 201990.9DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Academy for Life

MicroData Summary for Elio Sgreccia (VIAF: 100899341)
Elio Cardinal Sgreccia (born , died ) President Emeritus of Life

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArcevia, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceResidence, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,939
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 5 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast