Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Caetani

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1595³Born
14 Mar 162226.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
12 Jun 162226.9Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
14 Nov 162227.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Capua, Italy
17 Mar 162428.7SucceededArchbishop of Capua, Italy
19 Jan 162630.5Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 162630.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
1 Mar 162731.6ResignedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
15 Apr 164246.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Luigi Caetani (VIAF: 107188963)
Luigi Cardinal Caetani (born Jul 1595, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiedimonte
Ordained BishopSainte Marie Majeure, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 19, and Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,622, Number 25
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast