Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerian Rist, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1696BornNeuburg, Germany
3 Oct 173539.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
3 Oct 173539.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
28 Apr 173741.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
15 Sep 173741.6DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Valerian Rist:
Bishop Valerian Rist O.F.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015